Hall v. Edwards

Respondent: Lenard Edwards
Petitioner: Arizona Hall
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00556
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Referring Judge: Terry I. Adelman
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 11) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners Motion for Leave to Amend Petition (Doc. No. 14) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 5/6/2013. (KMS)
January 21, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Adelman's Report and Recommendation filed on December 31, 2013 is adopted and sustained in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for the District Judge and Magis trate Judge to Recuse Themselves and Charge of Conspiring with the State of Missouri (#31) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Order Granting Pro Se Status (#29) is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Finality of Determination (#37) is DENIED as MOOT.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Petiti oner's Motion for Leave to Supplement Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (#38) is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered thissame date. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/21/2014. (JMC)
April 9, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall forward to petitioner the court-provided form for filing a "Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner sha ll complete this form in its entirety and return it to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to complete and return this form within thirty days, the Court will dismiss this acti on without prejudice and without further notice to him. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a separate Order of Partial Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 5/9/2013. (2241 forms forwarded to petitioner). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/9/2013. (JMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hall v. Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lenard Edwards
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arizona Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]