Billingsley v. St. Joseph Health Center et al

Defendant: St. Charles County Sheriff's Department, St. Charles City Police Department, St. Joseph Health Center and City of St. Charles, Missouri
Plaintiff: Brian Billingsley
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00819
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Charles
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue as to defendants Sgt. Baumgarter, Officer S. Polster, and Officer W. Wilterhalt of the St. Charles City Police Department.IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that plaintiffs official-capacity claims areDISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Gayle Reneer is DISMISSEDwithout prejudice. A separate Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed forthwith. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 2/20/14. (CLA)
April 28, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 20 ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss [ECF No. 20] is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/28/14. (CEL)
January 13, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION,MEMORANDUM AND ORDERHEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $17.37 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed tomake his remittance payable to "Clerk,United StatesDistrictCourt," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the casenumber; and (4) that the remittance i s for an original proceeding. FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days, without first showing good cause, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice to plaintiff. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before February 14, 2014, that complies with this Memorandum and Order. FURTHER ORDERED that, in addition to a copy of this Order, the Clerk shallmail plaintiff a copy of the Courts formfor prisoners to file a "Complaint Under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1983." FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to complywith this Order, the Courtwill dismiss this actionwithout prejudice andwithout further notice to him. If the case is dismissed for non-compliance with this Order, the dismissal will not constitute a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g).. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 01/13/2014. (CLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Billingsley v. St. Joseph Health Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Sheriff's Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles City Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Charles, Missouri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Billingsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]