Taylor v. Hull et al

Defendant: Heather Unknown, Unknown Ruble, Unknown Milburn, Unknown Hull, Unknown Yancy and Troy Steele
Plaintiff: Samuel Lewis Taylor
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01065
Filed: June 4, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2013 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $75.58 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintif f is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued upon the complaint as to the following defendants in their individual capacities: (1) Unknown Hull, a correctional officer employed at PCC on June 3, 2012; (2) Unknown Milb urn, a correctional officer employed at PCC on June 3, 2012; (3) Unknown Ruble, a correctional officer employed at PCC on June 3, 2012; (4) Unknown Yancy, a Corizon nurse working at PCC on June 3, 2012; and (5) Heather Unknown, a Corizon nurse workin g at PCC on June 5, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Unknown Hull, Unknown Milburn, Unknown Ruble, Unknown Yancy, and Heather Unknown, in their individual capacities, shall file an answer or other responsive pleading within the time provid ed by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to this Courts differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (prisoner actions- standard). A separate order of partial dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/9/13. (KJS)
January 3, 2014 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summonses upon the complaint as to defendant Paula Heather, in her individual capacity, and as to defendant Pamala Yancy, in her individual capacity. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that the United States Marshal for this district is directed to personally serve the summonses and a copies of plaintiffs complaint on defendants Paula Heather and Pamala Yancy at the Potosi Correctional Center in Potosi, Missouri. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/3/14. (KJS)
February 13, 2014 44 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss [Doc. #41] is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/13/2014. (KMS)
March 26, 2014 53 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel the Missouri Attorney General's Office to produce the full names and addresses of defendants Paula Heather and Pamala Yancy [Doc. # 49 ] is denied. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that, on or before April 26, 2014, Jessica Liss, counsel for Corizon, shall provide the court with the last known addresses of defendants Paula Heather (or Heather Paul) and Pamala Yancy. Counsel's response to this Order should be ti tled "In Camera Response to Order of March 26, 2014," and should be mailed directly to the chambers of the undersigned at the following address: United States District Court, Eastern District ofMissouri, Eastern Division, 111 S. 10th Stre et, St. Louis, Missouri, 63102. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, upon of receipt of the in camera response, the court will either arrange for the issuance of the summonses on plaintiff's behalf as to defendants Paula Heather (or Heather Paul) and Pa mala Yancy, or it will notify plaintiff in writing that the information was not obtained. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on Jessica Liss, Jackson Lewis, P.C., 7733 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 600, St. Louis, MO 63105, through her email address registered with the court's CM/ECF filing system. ( Response to Court due by 4/26/2014.). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/26/14. (KKS)
April 21, 2014 55 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall prepare alias summonses for defendants Paula Heather (or Heather Paul) and Pamala Yancy, using their respective addresses listed in the in camera response [Doc. # 54 ], and s hall docket each alias summons under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve defendants Paula Heather (or Heather Paul) and Pamala Yancy in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Marshal's return of summons for each defendant shall be filed under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide the Marshals Service with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/21/14. (KJS)
August 26, 2013 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). A separate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/26/2013. (KMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taylor v. Hull et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Unknown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ruble
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Milburn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hull
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Yancy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Steele
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Lewis Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]