Anzaldua v. Northeast Ambulance and Fire Protection District et al

Defendant: Bridget Quinlisk-Dailey, Clarence Young, Derek Mays, Northeast Ambulance and Fire Protection District, Robert Lee, Quinten Randolph, Kenneth Farwell and Kate Welge
Plaintiff: Stevon Anzaldua
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01257
Filed: July 2, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 9 ] is DENIED in part, and GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts II, III, and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No . 1 ] are DISMISSED with prejudice, in their entirety, for failure to state a claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims brought against individual defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that Plaintiff's cause of action for municipal liability against Fire District, contained in Count I of his Complaint, is DISMISSED with prejudice, for failure to state a claim. As no claims against Fire District remain, it shall be dismi ssed from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any due process claims asserted by Plaintiff in his Complaint, are DISMISSED as abandoned. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against Defendants Clarence Young, Bridget Quinlisk-Dailey, and Quinten Randolph are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/21/2013. (CBL)
November 27, 2013 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 15 Memorandum & Order Dated October 21, 2013 [doc 15], or Alternatively, Motion for leave to Amend Complaint is HELD IN ABEYANCE, pending Plaintiff's submission of a proposed ame nded complaint. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed amended complaint, for the Court's considerataion, within fifteen (15) days of the entry of this Order. (Response to Court due by 12/12/2013.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on November 27, 2013. (MCB)
December 31, 2013 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Motion for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, to Lift Discovery Stay and Amend Case Management Order [ECF No. 40 ] is GRANTED. Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than January 6, 2014.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motio n to Extend Time to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First-Amended Complaint [ECF No. 41 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First-Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than January 8, 2014. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on December 31, 2013. (BRP)
February 5, 2014 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 37 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on February 5, 2014. (BRP)
February 5, 2014 49 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 29 ] is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. In accordance with the Court's discussion herein, Plaintiff is granted lea ve to file a First Amended Complaint asserting Counts I (42 U.S.C. Section 1983 Violation of Anzaldua's First Amendment Right to Free Speech) and II (Conspiracy to Violate Anzaldua's Constitutional Rights Cognizable Under 42 U.S.C. § ; 1983) as pleaded in the proposed First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 29-1]. Plaintiff is denied leave to file a First Amended Complaint asserting Counts III (Anzaldua's Cause of Action Under 18 U.S.C. § 2707 Against Defendants Farwell and W elge) and IV (Anzaldua's Cause of Action Under Section 537.525 of the Missouri Revised Statutes Against Defendants Farwell and Welge), as amendment would be futile. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's First Amend ed Complaint [ECF No. 29-1] are DISMISSED, with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in accordance with the Court's discussion and rulings herein, Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider Memorandum and Order Dated October 21, 2013 (Doc. 15), Alternat ively, Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint [ECF No. 18 ] is GRANTED, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint, in accordance with the Court's discussion herein, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 2/15/2014.). Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on February 5, 2014. (BRP)
February 5, 2014 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion, Affidavit, and Supporting Legal Memorandum to Defer Defendants' Premature Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Grant Additional Time for Plaintiff to C onduct Discovery and to Lift Stay on Discovery/Amend Case Management Order for Such Purpose [ECF No. 36 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 33 ] within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on February 5, 2014. (BRP)
February 19, 2014 55 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 54 MOTION to Lift Stay , Amend Case Management Order and Continue Trial Setting filed by Plaintiff Stevon Anzaldua. motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on February 19, 2014. (MCB)
March 17, 2014 63 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 33 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 53 ] is DISMISSED with prejudice, in its entirety. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 03/17/2014. (CBL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Anzaldua v. Northeast Ambulance and Fire Protection District et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Quinlisk-Dailey
Represented By: Erin E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Young
Represented By: Erin E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Mays
Represented By: Erin E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Ambulance and Fire Protection District
Represented By: Erin E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee
Represented By: Erin E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinten Randolph
Represented By: Erin E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Farwell
Represented By: Erin E. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Welge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevon Anzaldua
Represented By: Lynette M. Petruska
Represented By: Brandy B. Barth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]