Meier v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Meier
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv00031
Filed: April 6, 2009
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Referring Judge: Keith Strong
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 18 Featured Case FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael J. Astrue, 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Meier Objections to F&R due by 12/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Keith Strong on 12/3/2009. (SLL, )
December 21, 2009 21 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 11 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 14 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/21/2009. (SLR, )
July 7, 2011 38 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 1) The 27 Motion for EAJA Fees and Costs is DENIED. 2) The alternative 35 Motion for Fees and Costs under 406(b) is GRANTED. Counsel has provided evidence of the fee agreement with Plaintiff and of past due benefits awarded. Fees of $14,856.55 and costs of $805.00 are approved. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/7/2011. (SLR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Meier v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Meier
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]