Malo et al v. Holder et al

Defendant: Director Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder and Rosemary Langley Melville
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Alfaro Malo and Bob Huddleston State Farm Insurance Agency
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02257
Filed: December 29, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion Request for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Appropriate Pleading to 1 Complaint. Answer due 8/29/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 19, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 10/19/2012. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 22, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 03/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 22, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Aram A. Gavoor for Eric Holder, Rosemary Langley Melville, Alejandro Mayorkas and, Janet Napolitano. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 3/22/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malo et al v. Holder et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Aram A Gavoor
Represented By: Carlos A Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Aram A Gavoor
Represented By: Carlos A Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Represented By: Aram A Gavoor
Represented By: Carlos A Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Langley Melville
Represented By: Aram A Gavoor
Represented By: Carlos A Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Alfaro Malo
Represented By: Seth L Reszko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Huddleston State Farm Insurance Agency
Represented By: Seth L Reszko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]