Rivera v. Clark County, Nevada et al

Defendant: Virginia Valentine, Steve Siselak, Garhard "Gary&quot Torgerson, David Rogers, Larry Brown, Clark County, Nevada, Daniel Hoffman, Jacqueline Holloway, Camille Leavitt, T. Ann Aguon Perez and Andrew "Drew&quot Renter
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Rivera
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 10 Report and Recommendation should NOT be accepted and adopted. The Court refers the matter back to the Magistrate Judge for a resetting of the status hearing to provide the Plaintiff the opportunity to show cause why his case should not be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/16/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 19, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 19 Report and Recommendation. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 02/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 5, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a status hearing re 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is set for 2/1/2011 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. Only plaintiff, Juan Carlos Rivera, is required to appear in Court for this hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 1/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, cert 70090820000164176739)
September 27, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a status hearing is scheduled for October 22, 2012, at 9:30 AM in courtroom 3D, 3d floor, Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. So., Las Vegas, Nevada. The Court will also address the Application to Proceed in Dist rict Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 1 at this hearing. Only Plaintiff, Juan Carlos Rivera, is required to appear in Court for this hearing. Plaintiff is advised that failure to appear for this hearing may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, cert 70121010000121749565)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rivera v. Clark County, Nevada et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Valentine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Siselak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garhard "Gary&quot Torgerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County, Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hoffman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Holloway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille Leavitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ann Aguon Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew "Drew&quot Renter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Rivera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]