Gallo v. Burson et al

Plaintiff: Richard E. Gallo
Defendant: Lee Griggs, fnu Russell, Brian Williams, Cheryl Burson and Greg Cox
Case Number: 2:2011cv01080
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Extend Deadline. Amended Complaint deadline: 4/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 8, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 15 Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order Pursuant to FRCP Rule 60. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 13, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, subject to leave to amend within thirty (30) days of entry of this order to correct the deficiencies in the complaint if possible. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, forms and copies to plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallo v. Burson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Gallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Griggs
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fnu Russell
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Burson
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]