MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. v. Kolahzadeh et al Featured Case

Defendant: PokerSons, Roberto Ciamillo, Shahram Kolahzadeh, Evan Krentzman, RevNet and Adam Majewski
Plaintiff: MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv01929
Filed: December 1, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 62 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (SLR)
February 13, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 57 Stipulation to Transfer the <excaliburpoker.com> Domain Name Registration. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/13/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 13, 2012 60 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 58 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/13/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 13, 2012 59 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 2/13/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Smith. Pursuant to the submission of the Stipulation of Dismissal 58 , it is ordered that the hearing set February 14, 2012, at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman is vacated. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
February 13, 2012 58 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 13, 2012 57 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to TRANSFER THE <excaliburpoker.com> DOMAIN NAME REGISTRATION by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 10, 2012 56 MOTION to Withdraw 42 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Adam Majewski. Motion ripe 2/10/2012. (SLR)
February 9, 2012 55 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 2/9/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Smith. RE: 54 MOTION to Postpone Deposition of Adam Majewski - A Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for February 14, 2012, at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. It is ordered that the Response to the Motion is due by the close of business on February 13, 2012. The parties are instructed to call telephone number: (702) 868-4921, access code: 123456, 5 minutes prior to the hearing time. The Court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
February 8, 2012 54 MOTION to Postpone Deposition of Adam Majewski by Defendant Adam Majewski. Responses due by 2/25/2012. (SLR)
February 3, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER Granting 52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Rebecca A Fuller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 2, 2012 52 Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rebecca A. Fuller. by Defendant Adam Majewski. Motion ripe 2/2/2012. (Fuller, Rebecca)
February 1, 2012 51 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 47 Motion to Withdraw Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 1, 2012 50 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 2/1/2012. Pursuant to the Local Rules of Civil Practice, Rule 26-8, interrogatories, responses, and proofs of service shall not be filed with the Clerk of Court, unless ordered by the Court. Your documents are returned herewith. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Request from Adam Majewski) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 1, 2012 49 LETTER from Adam Majewski to Mr. Fountain. (SLR)
February 1, 2012 48 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 16 Motion Hearing, held on December 8, 2011, before Judge Philip M. Pro. Court Reporter/Transcriber: NW Transcripts, LLC, 208-908-7998. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2012. (JPQ)
January 31, 2012 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rebecca A. Fuller. by Defendant Adam Majewski. Motion ripe 1/31/2012. (Fuller, Rebecca)
January 27, 2012 46 REPLY to Response to 25 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 26, 2012 45 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER re 41 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/16/2012. Motions due by 5/16/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 26, 2012 44 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. and against Ciamillo and PokerSons on Count I of the Complaint. Defendant Ciamillo shall pay Plaintiff statutory damages in the amount of $100,000.00 and Defendant PokerSons shall pay Plaintiff statutory damages in the amount of $200,000.00. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 1/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 26, 2012 43 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. and against PokerSons in the amount of $200,000 and Roberto Ciamillo in the amount of $100,000. Clerk of the Court shall refund Plaintiffs $100.00 cash deposit. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, CC: Finance - SLR)
January 26, 2012 42 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Adam Majewski. Responses due by 2/12/2012. (Fuller, Rebecca)
January 25, 2012 41 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 24, 2012 40 MOTION for Default Judgment and Other Relief Against Defendants Ciamillo and PokerSons Only by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Motion ripe 1/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fountain, Jonathan)
January 17, 2012 39 RESPONSE to 25 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Complaint, filed by Defendant Adam Majewski. Replies due by 1/27/2012. (Fuller, Rebecca)
January 17, 2012 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 1/17/2012. By Deputy Clerk: D. Sherwood. IT IS ORDERED a Motion Hearing is set for 2/15/2012 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro on 15 Defendant Adam Majewski's Motion to Dismiss and 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, or in the alternative, to Prohibit Further Briefing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
January 10, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER Granting 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Shahram Kolahzadeh with prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 10, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER Granting 34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant RevNet LLC with prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 9, 2012 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Regading Defendant Shahram Kolahzadeh Only (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 9, 2012 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Regarding Defendant RevNet Only (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 9, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 32 Stipulation Order Transferring <ariapoker.com>. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/9/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 9, 2012 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Transferring <ariapoker.com> by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 6, 2012 31 REPLY to Response to 15 MOTION to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Adam Majewski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, Rebecca)
January 6, 2012 30 Order Granting 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/6/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 6, 2012 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Roberto Ciamillo and PokerSons re 28 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default. (SLR)
January 5, 2012 28 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Against Defendants Ciamillo and PokerSons by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Motion ripe 1/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jonathan W. Fountain)(Fountain, Jonathan)
January 5, 2012 27 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 28, 2011 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, to Prohibit Further Briefing; Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Adam Majewski's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue; Declaration of April Chaparian in Opposition to Defendant Adam Majewski's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venuel; and Declaration of Jonathan W. Fountain in Opposition to Defendant Adam Majewski's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP (b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 28, 2011 25 MOTION to Strike 23 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Responses due by 1/14/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 27, 2011 24 RESPONSE to 15 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Replies due by 1/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration April Chaparian, # 2 Declaration Jonathan W. Fountain)(Fountain, Jonathan)
December 27, 2011 23 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by Adam Majewski. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/6/2012. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/10/2012.(EDS)
December 22, 2011 22 NOTICE by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. re 21 Notice (Other). OF AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 21, 2011 21 NOTICE by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. of Filing Registrar Certificate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Registrar Certificate)(Fountain, Jonathan)
December 14, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER Granting 19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Evan Krentzman. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 13, 2011 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. With Respect to Defendant Evan Krentzman Only (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 13, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 17 Stipulation to Transfer Domain Name Registrations. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 13, 2011 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Transfer Domain Names by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 8, 2011 16 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2011 before Judge Philip M. Pro. Crtrm Administrator: D. Sherwood; Pla Counsel: Jonathan W. Fountain, Michael J. McCue; Def Counsel: Tim Whelan, Adam Majewski; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joan Quiros; Time of Hearing: 2:00 p.m.; Courtroom: 7C; The Court has been advised Mr. Whelan is appearing as counsel on behalf of Mr. Majewski. The Court hears the arguments of the parties. IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 4 is granted as to all defendants. Defendant Majewski's Motion to Dismiss will be considered once it is fully briefed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
December 8, 2011 15 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, to Transfer Venue by Defendant Adam Majewski. Responses due by 12/25/2011. (EDS)
December 7, 2011 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. re 6 Declaration, 1 Complaint, 10 Temporary Restraining Order, 8 Summons Issued, 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 5 Declaration,. (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 7, 2011 13 NOTICE by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. of filing Registrar Certificate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Registrar Certificate)(Fountain, Jonathan)
December 7, 2011 12 NOTICE by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. of Registrar Certificate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Registrar Certificate)(Fountain, Jonathan)
December 2, 2011 11 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.: $ 100.00, receipt number NVLAS007911. (EDS)
December 2, 2011 10 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and Order Setting Hearing on 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 12/7/2011. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 2, 2011 9 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 complaint) (EDS)
December 2, 2011 8 Summons Issued as to Roberto Ciamillo, Shahram Kolahzadeh, Evan Krentzman, Adam Majewski, PokerSons, and RevNet. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued as to Robert Ciamillo, # 2 Summons Issued as to RevNet, # 3 Summons Issued as to PokerSons, # 4 Summons Issued as to Evan Krentzman, # 5 Summons Issued as to Adam Majewski)(EDS)
December 1, 2011 7 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS)
December 1, 2011 Case assigned to Judge Philip M. Pro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (EDS)
December 1, 2011 6 DECLARATION of Jonathan W. Fountain re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Fountain, Jonathan)
December 1, 2011 5 DECLARATION of April Chaparian re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Fountain, Jonathan)
December 1, 2011 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Responses due by 12/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction)(Fountain, Jonathan)
December 1, 2011 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Motion ripe 12/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Fountain, Jonathan)
December 1, 2011 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International for MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. added.. (McCue, Michael)
December 1, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2199687), filed by MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/11/2011. Proof of service due by 3/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Kolahzadeh, # 3 Summons Krentzman, # 4 Summons Ciamillo, # 5 Summons Majewski, # 6 Summons RevNet, # 7 Summons PokerSons) (McCue, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc. v. Kolahzadeh et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PokerSons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Ciamillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahram Kolahzadeh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Krentzman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RevNet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Majewski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MGM Resorts International Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]