Ferm v. McCarty et al

Defendant: Colleen McCarty, 8 News Now General Manager, 8newsnow.com, Paula Francis, Steve Kanigher, Klas, LLC, Gary Waddell and Emily T. Neilson
Plaintiff: Jack Ferm
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00782
Filed: May 10, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all further proceedings in this case are STAYED until further order of this court except that parties may file responses and replies to 69 MOTION to Expedite, 70 and 74 MOTIONS to Strike, and 76 COUNTER-MOTION to Have Todd Kennedy Declared a Vexatious Litigant. Defendants need not file a response to 93 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider. Leave to file surreplies or supplements is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 29, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 29, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw. 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is DEEMED WITHDRAWN. Defendants counter-request for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 53 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Exclude Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 68 Defendants' Motion to for an Order to Show Cause. Plaintiffs 75 Second Response and Defendants 96 Second Reply are STRICKEN. Defendants request for a stay is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Defendants' Motion to Strike, and 50 Plaintiffs Supplement (Dkt. #50) is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 106 Plaintiff's Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 76 Plaintiff's Motion to Have Todd Kennedy Declared a Vexatious Litigant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 31, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Striking 74 Plaintiff's duplicative Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 20, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 109 , 112 , 113 , 114 , 115 , 116 , and 118 Reports and Recommendations in their entirety. IT IS ORDERED that 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is Granted in part consistent with the body of Judge Leen's 109 Orde r and Report and Recommendation. 5 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/28/2013. 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. 61 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 02/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ferm v. McCarty et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen McCarty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8 News Now General Manager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8newsnow.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Francis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kanigher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klas, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Waddell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily T. Neilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Ferm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]