Wald v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Tony A. Wald
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01423
Filed: August 10, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER that 13 Motion to Serve Party with Summons and Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 6, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER Concerning Review of Social Security Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 13, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER Accepting and Adopting 24 Report and Recommendation and Granting 23 Defendant's Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 01/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 22, 2012 2 Featured Case ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint via certified mail pursuant to the Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons to the US Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the US Marshal for service. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's counsel Mr. Kalagian shall have until August 31, 2012, to comply with Local Rule IA 10-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 24, 2014 35 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees and Expenses is awarded in favor of Plaintiff Tony A. Wald and against Defendant Michael J. Astrue in the amount of $3,600.00. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 04/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wald v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony A. Wald
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]