Johnson v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Colette Johnson
Case Number: 2:2012cv01438
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail to: Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear St, Suite 899, San Francisco, CA 94105-1545. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/5/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 14, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 16 Motion to Serve Party with Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/14/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 24, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney Marc Kalagian, shall have until 10/24/2012, to comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colette Johnson
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]