Hoang Dinh et al v. The United States of America et al

Defendant: Janet Napolitano, Leander B. Holston, Alejandro Mayorkas, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and United States of America
Plaintiff: Man Van Chau and Vy Nhu Hoang Dinh
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01795
Filed: October 11, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney. Attorney Stefanie Notarino Hennes is permitted to practice before this Court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 14, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER Denying 13 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is remanded to USCIS to re-adjudicate the Form I-130 Petition and Form I-485 filed by Chau and Dinh on October 23, 2006. (AR 13336, 51415.) USCIS may not use 8 U.S.C. § 1154(c) as a basis to deny the Form I-130 Petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 21, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER Granting 5 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney Sherease Rosalyn Pratt as to Defendants Eric H. Holder, Jr,Sherease Rosalyn Pratt for Leander B. Holston,Sherease Rosalyn Pratt for Alejandro Mayorkas,Sherease Rosalyn Pratt for Janet Napolitano,Sherease Rosalyn Pratt for United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hoang Dinh et al v. The United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leander B. Holston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Carlos A Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Man Van Chau
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vy Nhu Hoang Dinh
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]