Berman v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Cherylin F. Berman
Case Number: 2:2012cv01816
Filed: October 17, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING 8 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Defendant Colvin's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. This action be remanded to the Commissioner pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for a de novo hearing before an ALJ within ninety days. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Social Security Commissioner - EDS)
March 21, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Cherylin F. Berman against Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 3/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
September 29, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 20 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall prepare and file within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order a joint proposed form of order consistent with the Court� 39;s instructions regarding which fees appropriately are included within the award. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall seal 20 in its entirety. Plaintiff Cherylin F. Berman's counsel shall re-file the entire Application, including all exhibi ts, with appropriate redactions to all exhibits, for the public record in accordance with Special Order No. 108 within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall unseal all other documents in the case. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall substitute Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, for Michael J. Astrue as the Defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 14, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court In accordance with this Court's Order 23 dated September 29, 2014, and pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff Cherylin F. Berman and against Defendant Carolyn W. Col vin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, in the amount of $5,891.74 in attorneys fees and $350.00 in costs. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Cherylin F. Berman is hereby awarded $12,405.48 in attorney's fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C . § 406(b). FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff Cherylin F. Berman shall refund to Plaintiff Cherylin F. Berman $5,891.74, the amount of the 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) award. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berman v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherylin F. Berman
Represented By: Richard E. Donaldson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]