Wells v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Leonardo Debess Wells, Sr.
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2013cv00529
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall re-issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and shall deliver a copy of the summons and 7 Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 5, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse or remand which complies with the requirements set forth in the courts 20 Scheduling Order no later than April 3, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 20, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in its entirety Magistrate Judge Leen's 17 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default is Denied and Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Default Judgment is Denied. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 6, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until June 6, 2013, in which to file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Alternatively, Plaintiff may pay the $350.00 filing fee no later than June 6, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; blank ifp to plaintiff - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Debess Wells, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]