Beatty v. Nevens et al

Petitioner: Sterling P. Beatty
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Warden D. Nevens
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00764
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER that the Clerk shall Electronically Serve the Petition upon the respondents. Respondents shall have 45 days from entry of this Order within which to answer, or otherwise respond to, the petition. Denying 2 and 5 Motions for Appointment of Counsel and 6 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 8, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER that, from this date forward, the hard copy of any exhibits shall be forwardedfor this caseto the staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 5, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER Denying Petitioner's 34 Motion to Preclude Prosecution from Filing a Response to 13 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Due to Procedural Default. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 31, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER that 4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date on which this order is entered to pay the required $5.00 filing fee. The clerk shall retain the petition but not file it at this time. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/31/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 28, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date on which this order is entered to return the petition including the required signatures. Signature Page due by 7/28/2013. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: plaintiff with required documents - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Beatty v. Nevens et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sterling P. Beatty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden D. Nevens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]