Insight Technology Incorporated v. Surefire, LLC

 
Case Number: 1:2004cv00074
Filed: February 26, 2004
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2008 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 192 Motion for Leave to File Supplements to Motion for Summary Judgment. Parties to refile Motions for Summary Judgment as outlined on or before 10/24/08. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
February 5, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as outlined 207 Motion to Strike 204 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
April 3, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 204 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
May 12, 2009 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 203 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk to schedule trial. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
September 8, 2009 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Parties to file a notice of status of mediation. If they have not yet begun mediation, parties are directed to do so. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
September 21, 2009 263 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re: preparation for trial. ( Exhibit Lists/Objections due by 10/7/2009. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 10/2/2009 re filings as outlined.) Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
September 21, 2009 264 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Motion to Bifurcate: Reset Deadline as to 262 MOTION to Bifurcate Inequitable Conduct and Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to Inequitable Conduct : Follow up on Objection on 10/2/2009. Plaintiff's Supplemental Memoranda addressing scheduling of bench trial on inequitable conduct issue due 9/30/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
September 23, 2009 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : parties to submit product samples on or before 9/30/09. Counsel to address and resolve discrepancies among their proposed jury instructions and the court's claim construction order. ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/30/2009 for sample products to be submitted.) Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
October 5, 2009 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 280 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (lt)
October 6, 2009 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re use of original claim construction in the jury instructions. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
October 7, 2009 295 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re: filing of claim construction briefs addressing the meaning of "structural member extending upward from a[ ] side of the housing." ( Briefs due 10/14/2009 by 5 pm. Responsive brief deadline set for 10/16/2009 by 5 pm) Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
October 7, 2009 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 262 Motion to Bifurcate. The bench trial on the defense of inequitable conduct will be held, if necessary, after the completion of the jury trial at a time to be scheduled. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
October 8, 2009 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting as outlined as to the adapter theory, the direct contact theory and the arc theory re: 246 Motion in Limine (No 7) to Preclude SureFire from Arguing Undisclosed or Legally Incorrect Non-Infringement Theories; t he structural member theory remains under consideration pending claim construction; Granting in part as to testimony by John Matthews about prior art and denying without prejudice in part re: 247 Motion in Limine (No 8) to Preclude SureFire from Presenting Undisclosed Invalidity Theories or Prior Art Witnesses at Trial. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
October 8, 2009 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting to the extent as outlined 240 Motion in Limine (No 2) to Preclude Expert Testimony From Any SureFire Witness Other Than Christian W. Hughes and John Wilson. SureFire to file detailed written proffers of testimony of fact witnesses it plans to call at trial by 10/15/09. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
October 8, 2009 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as outlined 245 Motion in Limine (No 6) to Preclude Evidence Relating to Settlement Negotiations or Agreement with Glock. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Insight Technology Incorporated v. Surefire, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]