National Pasteurized Eggs, LLC v. Davidson

Plaintiff: National Pasteurized Eggs, LLC
Defendant: L. John Davidson
Counter Claimant: L. John Davidson
Counter Defendant: National Pasteurized Eggs, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00103
Filed: April 6, 2007
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Barbadoro
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2011 118 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim; denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment as to APPs 16-20 (the "Jumbo"); denying 79 Motion for Summary Judgment Refiled to replace Doc. 77-2 filed in error. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
February 10, 2011 120 Featured Case Procedural Order as to Bench Trial. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
April 12, 2011 124 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re July 18, 2011 Bench Trial. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
December 15, 2011 156 Featured Case ///FINDINGS OF FACT, RULINGS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT: Based on the findings and rulings, the clerk shall enter judgment for National Pasteurized Eggs on its claim that it owns all right, title and interest in the Jumbo, U.S. Patent No 6,692,784. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
March 2, 2012 161 Featured Case ORDER denying 159 Motion for Reconsideration re: 157 Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 19, 2010 55 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Paul J. Barbadoro recused Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (mm)
February 18, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
May 12, 2010 89 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER as to the Telephone Conference held on May 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
June 9, 2010 96 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 80 Motion to Amend; denying as moot 84 Motion to Strike; denying 85 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 71 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff to file response to the defendant's summary judgment motion and reply to the defendant's objection to the plaintiff's summary judgment motion within 30 days of this order. Defendant to file his reply, if any, to plaintiff's objection within 14 days of its filing. No surreplies. Counsel shall file a joint written report with the court on or before June 17, 2010 as to agreed upon attorneys' fees and costs. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: National Pasteurized Eggs, LLC v. Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Pasteurized Eggs, LLC
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. John Davidson
Represented By: Steven M. Latici
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: L. John Davidson
Represented By: Steven M. Latici
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: National Pasteurized Eggs, LLC
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]