Palermo v. Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Palermo
Defendant: Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, Ken Threlfail and Debbie LNU
Case Number: 1:2008cv00087
Filed: March 7, 2008
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Rockingham
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 16 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2-3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Ready for Trial on 11/3/2009. Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/1/2009. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 4/15/2009. (kad)
December 2, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, recommending that it be denied. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 12/19/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
December 29, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 21 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (kad) Modified on 1/12/2009 to add relationship to 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (dae).
January 13, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint as to defendant LNU: plaintiff having failed to identify and service defendant LNU, recommending that that claim be dismissed. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 2/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
February 3, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 24 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palermo v. Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Palermo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Threlfail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]