O'Neil v. O'Mara

Plaintiff: Jeffery C. O'Neil, Sr.
Defendant: James O'Mara
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00396
Filed: October 3, 2008
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2009 14 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: recommending dismissal of the request for preliminary injunctive relief but does not pertain to plaintiff's request for punitive damages. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 3/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)
March 27, 2009 20 Featured Case ORDER approving 14 Report and Recommendations; denying without prejudice 12 Motion for Inujunctive Relief. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
May 11, 2010 42 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 37 Dr.Ward's motion for summary judgment; and granting 38 defendants' motion for summary judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lag)
February 5, 2009 7 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service against defendants O'Mara and Ryan. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)
February 23, 2009 9 Featured Case ORDER re: plaintiff's preliminary injunction request. Defendant O'Mara is ordered to produce plaintiff's medical file at the hearing. The Clerk is directed to order transport of plaintiff. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/3/2009 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: O'Neil v. O'Mara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery C. O'Neil, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Mara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]