Duncan v. Newcome et al

Plaintiff: Richard L. Duncan
Defendant: Andrew Newcome, FNU Honeman, Cathleen Anderson, FNU Goodwin, Lakes Region Facility, Warden, NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner and FNU Daniells
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00477
Filed: December 8, 2008
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Belknap
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, recommending that the case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay initial filing fee as ordered. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 2/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)
February 4, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 10 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
December 9, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Richard L. Duncan, initial fee of $2.40. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 1/9/2009. (jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Duncan v. Newcome et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Duncan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Newcome
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Honeman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathleen Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Goodwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakes Region Facility, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Daniells
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]