Picard v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department et al

Plaintiff: Warren Picard
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department, Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, FNU Baldwin, FNU Dornall, FNU Dusenbaumb and FNU Robinson
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00259
Filed: August 5, 2009
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Merrimack
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2009 3 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff has filed two complaint documents that, because they were filed together, were filed as a single action in 1:09-cv-259-PB. Upon review of the file, it is readily apparent that Picard intended to file two action s. The Clerk's Office is order to: Open a new case for the second action, the complaint for which is comprised of pages 15-21 of doc. no. 1 in 1:09-cv-259-PB; in the newly opened case, docket the in forma pauperis, filings and orders thereon th at have previously been filed in the first case; docket copy of this order in the newly opened case; forward new case, once opened, immediately to the undersigned for preliminary review. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jeb)
December 11, 2009 5 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Amended Complaint, recommending dismissal of the RHU conditions claims, the RHU placement claim, and the verbal harassment claims from this action. Further recommending that O'Mara, Baldwi n and Dornall be dismissed from Picard's retaliation claims. Simultaneous order will direct service of the capped fire sprinkler claim against O'Mara, the forced labor claim against Dusenbaum, the endangerment claims against Robinson, Baldwin, and Dornall, and the retaliation claim against Robinson. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 12/28/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (vln)
December 11, 2009 6 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (vln)
December 29, 2009 7 Featured Case ORDER approving 5 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (vln)
February 10, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (mxm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Picard v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Picard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dornall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dusenbaumb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]