Banks v. Hall et al

Plaintiff: Robert Banks
Defendant: Mark B Hall, Robert Lima, Dean Holston, Francesco Campo, Michael Cedrone, Gerard Ditolla, Chad Lavoie and State of New Hampshire, Treasurer
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00326
Filed: September 23, 2009
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Merrimack
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint. Service of Banks' Fourth Amendment claims of excessive force and failure to intervene against defendants listed. Clerk's Office to serve NH Attorney General as provided in Agreement on Acceptance of Service as outlined. Defendants to answer within 20 days of acceptance of service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
February 5, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 9 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
June 14, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 22 Notice of Offer; return to submitting party. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
August 30, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (gla)
September 1, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 28 Motion for Leave to Depose Incarcerated Party. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (gla)
September 25, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Robert Banks, initial fee of $4.00. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 10/29/2009. (jeb)
September 23, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 38 Motion for Reconsideration - plaintiff has until 10/1/10 to object. Set Deadlines as to 38 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Denying Rule 6(b)(1)(A) Request for Extending Time for Taking Plaintiff's Deposition. (Follow up on Objection on 10/1/2010.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (dae)
October 12, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (lt)
November 16, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER : Plaintiff's case is dismissed, voluntarily, without prejudice. Clerk to enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
January 20, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, 8 Motion to Amend: recommending the dismissal of the official capacity claims, the Eighth Amendment claim, and defendants Kia and the State Treasurer. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 2/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Banks v. Hall et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark B Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lima
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Holston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesco Campo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cedrone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Ditolla
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Lavoie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Hampshire, Treasurer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]