Starr v. Moore et al

 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00440
Filed: December 16, 2009
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER : NH Attorney General's Office to arrange for Plaintiff Darren Starr to be transported to the USDC-NH for his hearing 9/2/11 at 2 PM. If video equipment is fixed before that time, the court will hold the hearing with Mr. Starr appearing via video. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
December 18, 2009 3 Featured Case ORDER approving 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Darren Starr, initial fee of $18.60. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 1/20/2010. (amm)
March 22, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER on Jury Selection as outlined. 8 jurors; 3 peremptory challenges each. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
March 28, 2012 46 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 31 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Litigation; granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 32 Motion in Limine to Give Instruction that Plaintiff Engaged in Protected Activity; denying without prejudice 36 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Incidents that Occurred on Dates Other Than July 4, 2007. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 27, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to complete service documents and forward to the US Marshal to Make Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (cmp)
August 18, 2010 7 Featured Case ///ORDER: after consideration of the objection filed, 4 Report and Recommendation approved. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Starr v. Moore et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]