Whitten v. Northern NH Correctional Facility, Warden et al

Case Number: 1:2009cv00450
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating, in part, 5 Order Directing Service. The portion of the Order directing service on Drs. Eppolito and Englander is vacated and new directions as to service substituted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justo Arenas. (jab)
February 12, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 4 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (vln)
March 15, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing claims against Dr. William Eppolito without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (vln)
April 8, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 24 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's motion/request for preliminary injunction, which was included in his complaint, is hereby denied. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
August 13, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. The complaint is dismissed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (vln)
December 30, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Donald Whitten, initial fee of $6.80. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 1/30/2010. (jeb)
January 22, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, recommending dismissal of all claims asserted against the defendants in their official capacities. In addition, any claim alleging constitutional violations relating to prison overcro wding or a denial of access to grievance procedures should be dismissed. The remaining claims asserted under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, alleging inadequate medical care and supervisory liability, may proceed against the defendants in their individual capacities. Service of these remaining claims on the defendants is directed in an Order issued this date. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 2/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (vln)
January 22, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (vln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitten v. Northern NH Correctional Facility, Warden et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]