Levesque v. Merrimack County Department of Corrections

 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00453
Filed: January 21, 2010
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER: Pleadings to be redocketed as addenda to the complaint in the cases as outlined. As to claims against Eppolito, Sylvester and the MCHC, Clerk's Office to complete summons forms, issue and forward to US Marshal for service. Defendants to answer within 20 days. As to claims against SPU and Steven, Clerk's Office directed to serve the NH AG as provided in Agreement on Acceptance of Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
June 9, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER approving 15 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (lt)
June 10, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER : After reviewing objections to Report and Recommendations (R&R) filed in 09cv437, R&R 15 in this case is approved as noted in June 9, 2010 order. This case shall be consolidated into 09cv437 in accordance with R&R. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
January 22, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 5 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Andre R. Levesque, initial fee of $16.40. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. Fee due 2/22/2010. (jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Levesque v. Merrimack County Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]