Turner v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. et al

 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2010
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: James R. Muirhead
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, recommending that it be it be denied. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 1/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab)
January 11, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 11 Report and Recommendations; denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
January 20, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jab) Modified on 1/25/2010 to correct the name of the judge. (jab).
January 26, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 15 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. ( Status Report due by 4/26/2010.) Signed by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
August 10, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
January 7, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, The clerk's office is directed to schedule a hearing for Friday, January 8, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Turner v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]