Simons et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Case Number: 1:2010cv00021
Filed: January 15, 2010
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court CONCURRING ORDER: ME District Judge George Z. Singal shall be designated andassigned to preside over this case. Magistrate Judge John H. Rich III is assigned to perform such duties as may be assigned to him by the district judge to whom this case is assigned. Signed by USDC-ME Chief Judge John A. Woodcock. (jeb)
January 21, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jeb)
January 22, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (jeb)
December 20, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 52 Stipulation of Dismissal as to and for Judgment. So Ordered by Judge George Z. Singal.(ko)
January 22, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jeb)
January 25, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jeb)
January 28, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simons et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]