Bedrock Realty Trust v. Laconia Savings Bank et al

Case Number: 1:2010cv00062
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting the 8 Objection to 4 Order dated March 2, 2010 as an appeal of that order. Trustee to file affidavit and supporting document to establish that he is both trustee and sole beneficiary of the trust within 14 days of the date of this order. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 3/26/2010.) Signed by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
March 23, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 17 Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with Order dated March 12, 2010. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 4/22/2010.) Signed by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
March 2, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Pursuant to LR 83.6(c), a corporation, unincorporated association or trust may not appear in any action or proceeding pro se. Accordingly, plaintiff is responsible to assure counsel files an appearance on its behalf. ( Follow up on 4/2/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedrock Realty Trust v. Laconia Savings Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]