Antaeus Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Davidson

Plaintiff: Antaeus Enterprises, Inc. and James L. Rand
Defendant: L. John Davidson
Case Number: 1:2010cv00126
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re: Pretrial Conference set for July 16, 2010 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
March 29, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Discovery shall proceed on an expedited basis, consistent with Part IV of this order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
June 1, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antaeus Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antaeus Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Russell F. Hilliard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Rand
Represented By: Russell F. Hilliard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. John Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]