Moore et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Angela Jo Moore and M. Porter Moore
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00241
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving (with changes) 8 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/1/2011. (cmp)
April 25, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 123 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 124 Motion for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law; granting 126 Motion for Summary Judgment Replaces document no. 125. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 14, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER dismissing without prejudice 96 Counterclaim. Deutsche Bank's counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute but may be reinstated within 14 days upon a showing of good cause. The clerk shall enter an amended judgment in accord with this order. The case will remain closed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 21, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Amend Complaint & Add Party Defendants. Defendants to notify court re proceeding on motions to dismiss (docs. no. 16 and 17) as outlined by January 28, 2011; supplemental objections to motions to dismiss (if any) due by February 11, 2011; replies to supplemental objections (if any) due by February 23, 2011. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
November 1, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court SUMMARY ORDER: Plaintiffs to serve defendant WMC Mortgage Corp. as outlined no later than 21 days from the date of this order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 27, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss (Ocwen); granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss (MERS); granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss (Saxon); granting in p art and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss (Harmon); granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Dismiss (Morgan Stanley); granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss (Deutsche Bank); granting 80 Motion to Dismiss (WMC Mortgage Corp). So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 8, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
February 8, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 92 Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
August 5, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re preliminary pretrial conference scheduled for 8/12/10, 11 AM. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Jo Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Porter Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. D. Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. D. Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. D. Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]