PC Connection, Inc. v. Crabtree et al

Defendant: Computer Connections, Dayton Crabtree and pc-connections.com
Plaintiff: PC Connection, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00348
Filed: August 10, 2010
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER, As sufficient notice, as defined by the terms of the TRO, has not been effected, and because, in any event, this court does not appear to have personal jurisdiction over the defendant, the court is holding in abeyance the hearing on the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction until such time as plaintiff comes forward with evidence sufficient to establish that notice and service have properly been accomplished. 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)
September 16, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER, Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief set for October 5, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. The Court allows defendant to file a brief in support of his motions by September 24, 2010. The plaintiff is allowed to file a re sponsive brief to defendant's venue and personal jurisdiction motion by October 1, 2010.( Responsive briefs due 10/1/2010, Brief in support of motions due 9/24/2010, Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/5/2010 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)
September 30, 2010 16 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER 13 Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ( Exhibit List due by 10/4/2010, Witness List due by 10/4/2010.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)
October 4, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion for to Appear Telephonically. Defendant is permitted to appear by video conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)
December 6, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER denying 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff has failed to satisfy the Negron-Torres test for personal jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court declines to exercise personal jurisdic tion over defendant. The motion for preliminary injunction is denied. This case is to be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia for consideration. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)
August 20, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER Granting 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.( Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/2/2010 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PC Connection, Inc. v. Crabtree et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Connections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayton Crabtree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pc-connections.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PC Connection, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Grill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]