Glidden v. Franklin County Probate/Family Court et al

Defendant: Cheshire County Superior Court and Franklin County Probate/Family Court
Plaintiff: Morris Glidden
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00350
Filed: August 10, 2010
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
 
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PROHIBITING ELECTRONIC ACCESS re: writ of mandamus So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (amm)
August 12, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECT ORDER PROHIBITING REMOTE ELECTRONIC ACCESS 1 Writ of Mandamus. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (amm)
November 3, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, recommending that it be dismissed. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 11/22/2010. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (vln)
December 2, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 5 Report and Recommendations. The case is hereby dismissed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (vln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Glidden v. Franklin County Probate/Family Court et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheshire County Superior Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Probate/Family Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Glidden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]