Eckler v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Christopher W. Eckler
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00375
Filed: August 25, 2010
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER dismissing 1 Complaint without prejudice. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
August 31, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
October 12, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 7 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge McCafferty; denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
December 9, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Service is to be made by 12/23/2010 re 4 Summons. Case will be dismissed without prejudice on that date, unless the Court received return of service documents or a motion to extend time to effect service. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 12/23/2010.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckler v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher W. Eckler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]