Oughman v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent

Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Plaintiff: Mohamed Oughman
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00075
Filed: February 22, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. The Clerk's office is directed to forward a blank summons form to plaintiff, who must complete and return the summons form for defendant Scurry. The Clerk's office will issu e the summons and forward to US Marshal's Service with copies of the complaint (doc nos. 1, 3, 7 and 10), the Reports and Recommendations (doc. nos. 5 and 14), Order (doc. no. 6) and this order for service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
November 16, 2011 20 Featured Case /// ORDER approving 5 Report and Recommendations; approving 14 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
November 30, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER approving 21 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/15/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/15/2012. Discovery deadline 11/1/2012. Mediation Follow Up on 8/15/2012.(jab)
April 10, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
May 9, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER re 31 Objection to Order of April 10, 2012. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
July 30, 2012 35 Featured Case ORDER approving 33 Report and Recommendations; denying without prejudice 27 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
October 25, 2012 42 Featured Case /// ORDER approving the 40 Report and Recommendation; granting Defendant's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
August 29, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service: the Clerk's office is directed to forward a blank summons form to plaintiff, who must complete and return the summons form for defendant Barnes within 10 days. The Clerk's office will issue the summons and forward to US Marshal's Service with copies of the complaint (doc nos. 1 and 3), the Report and Recommendation, and this order for service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Oughman v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Oughman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]