Podkulski v. Doe et al

Defendant: FNU Hujsak, Barbara LNU, John Doe, FNU Gordon, Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, FNU Robinson and Jane Doe
Plaintiff: Steve Podkulski
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00102
Filed: March 7, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
December 20, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to make service as outlined as to Sergeant Gordon and Officer Barbara. Defendants to answer within 21 days of service. Plaintiff granted leave to amend compliant within 60 days of the date of this Order; failure to amend may result in a recommendation that the court dismiss claims. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
April 18, 2012 27 Featured Case ///ORDER approving approving 13 Report and Recommendations; approving 24 Report and Recommendations; denying without prejudice 21 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
May 3, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 MOTION for Interrogatories, denying 26 MOTION for Production of Documents, denying without prejudice 30 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, ORDER Directing clerk to forward Summonses and Documents as outlined to the US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(cmp) Modified on 5/4/2012 to add date filed: (cmp).
June 5, 2012 37 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 31 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
March 9, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial filing fee is waived due to account balance of $0.23. Thereafter 20% of each preceding month's income credited to the plaintiff's account shall be remitted when the account balance exceeds $10 until the sum of $350 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 4/4/2011. (amm)
October 11, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion to Seal Document (last known address information for defendant Ryan Donovan) at Level II. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Sealed Document deadline 11/15/2013.(cmp)
October 11, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER denying 39 Motion for leave to file a late objection to the March 12, 2012, report and recommendation for the reasons stated herein. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(cmp)
November 23, 2012 56 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 46 Report and Recommendation, recommending that Claims 2(a), 2(d), and 2(f)and all claims asserted against Office Hujsak be dismissed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
January 23, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion for Leave to File Early Summary Judgment Motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
February 13, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER: The parties have agreed to file with the court a joint proposed discovery plan on or before March 15, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(cmp)
March 11, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 62 Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Discovery Plan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Follow up on Discovery Plan 4/1/2013.(gla)
April 9, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER approving as outlined 64 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 9/3/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 12/16/2013. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/2/2014. Discovery deadline 4/15/2014. (dae)
May 20, 2013 70 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 67 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Clerk to provide local rules to plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
July 9, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER approving 71 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ko)
August 14, 2013 80 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerks Office to forward service documents to the US Marshal to Make Service on Sgt. Joshua Jordan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Podkulski v. Doe et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hujsak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Podkulski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]