Lorrain v. Branscombe

Plaintiff: Lisa Lorrain
Defendant: John Branscombe
Case Number: 1:2011cv00145
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 4, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for May 9, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
May 12, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving (with changes) 5 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4-5 days. Case Track: Standard. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 2/1/2012. (cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorrain v. Branscombe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lorrain
Represented By: Daniel G. Lilley Law Offices, P.A.
Represented By: Paul A. Maggiotto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Branscombe
Represented By: Robert C. Dewhirst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]