Cook v. Merrimack County Department of Corrections, Superintendent

Defendant: Robert Hage, Merrimack County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, Nancy Gallagher and William Griffin
Plaintiff: Shaun M. Cook
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00198
Filed: April 26, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PROHIBITING REMOTE ELECTRONIC ACCESS re: 1 Complaint filed by Shaun M. Cook. Fails to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a)., one or more personal identifiers are listed in the document. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(amm)
October 28, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
November 21, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 21 Report and Recommendations. Failure to file any objection to R&R precludes any appeal of this case to the First Circuit Court of Appeals. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
January 4, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 25 Report and Recommendations; denying 23 Motion for Return of plaintiff to NH, etc. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cook v. Merrimack County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrimack County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Gallagher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Griffin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun M. Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]