Safeco Insurance Company of America v. EMC Mortgage LLC et al

Defendant: Wayne Nolette and EMC Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Cross Defendant: Wayne Nolette
Cross Claimant: EMC Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00226
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Refiled, See Doc. 13 . ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Declare Respondent Wayne Nolette Properly Served. Motion to permit service by publication is also denied. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae) Modified on 8/15/2011 to add: Refiled, See Doc. 13 .(dae).
August 15, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Corrected) denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Declare Respondent Wayne Nolette Properly Served. Motion to permit service by publication is also denied. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
October 17, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 24, 2011 at 2:30 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 24, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 18 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1 Day. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 12/1/2011.(cmp)
December 19, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Motion for Default Judgment as to Wayne Nolette. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. EMC Mortgage LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Nolette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Courtney H. G. Herz
Represented By: James F. Ogorchock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Wayne Nolette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: EMC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]