Infra-Metals Co. v. Steven D. Griffin, et al

Defendant: Steven D. Griffin and Arnold Hanson, Jr.
Plaintiff: Infra-Metals Co.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00314
Filed: June 28, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1725 Collection under Contract Guaranty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2011 14 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for September 15, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 14, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Petition to Attach with Notice. Plaintiff to file amended complaint on or before October 14, 2011. New joint discovery plan to be filed as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 6, 2012 42 Featured Case ORDER re 40 Suggestion of Bankruptcy as to Steven D. Griffin. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362, the case is automatically stayed as to the bankrupt party but shall otherwise proceed as to the remaining parties. It is ordered that counsel for the petitioner in bankruptcy shall file a status report on January 1 and July 1 of each year until the bankruptcy matter is finally resolved. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Infra-Metals Co. v. Steven D. Griffin, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Griffin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Hanson, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infra-Metals Co.
Represented By: Kristen Starble Harris
Represented By: Jonathan Starble
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]