Wenzel v. Great Lakes Hydro America LLC

Defendant: Great Lakes Hydro America LLC
Plaintiff: Cody Wenzel
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00327
Filed: July 5, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 Consolidation Order, 11 and 12 Objections to Consolidation Order: 11cv327-JL and 11cv335-JD are not consolidated. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
November 22, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for December 1, 2011 at 2:30 p.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 23, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 30 Motion for Contempt Against Defendant Great Lakes Hydro America, LLC for Failure to Comply with Court Order on Discovery; striking 31 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant Great Lakes Hydro America, LLC. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 29, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 11, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court SIGNED ORDER Approving Settlement. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wenzel v. Great Lakes Hydro America LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Hydro America LLC
Represented By: Gregory A. Moffett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Wenzel
Represented By: Christopher E. Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]