SignalQuest, Inc. v. Chou et al

Defendant: Tien-Ming Chou and Oncque Corporation
Plaintiff: SignalQuest, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00392
Filed: August 9, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER re 15 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process. Parties to respond as outlined by April 13, 2012. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 22, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 6/5/2012.(jb)
July 10, 2012 29 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 13, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 9, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion for Pre-Markman Hearing Mediation and Limited Pre-Mediation Discovery. Deadlines as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 19, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER approving as outlined 42 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Complex. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 5/6/2013. Joint claim construction & prehearing statement 7/26/13. Claim Construction briefs set for 9/6/2013; responsive briefs 9/20/13. Claim construction hearing (est.) 11/22/13. Fact Discovery deadline 4/21/2014. (dae)
November 14, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER denying 7 Motion for for Service of Process by Clerk of Court. Plaintiff's counsel may attempt to effectuate foreign service through the clerk's office without the need for judicial intervention. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SignalQuest, Inc. v. Chou et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tien-Ming Chou
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oncque Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SignalQuest, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]