People's United Bank v. Mountain Home Developers of Sunapee, LLC et al

Defendant: Bardon Flanders, Charles Terry Finch, Robert Flanders, Mountain Home Developers of Sunapee, LLC, Dana Michael Stevens, Gary Williams and Gina Williams
Plaintiff: People's United Bank
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00393
Filed: August 10, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
March 13, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and holding in abeyance in part 18 Motion to Compel; denying 19 Motion for Protective Order; deferring ruling on 20 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(kad)
March 29, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Compel Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(iii) Disclosure and/or Supplementation and Request for Expedited Consideration Pursuant to LR 7.1(f). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
September 6, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendants shall comply with the clerks order on or before September 20, 2012. Any defendant who does not file an appearance by September 20, 2012, will be defaulted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(kad)
September 6, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant (Mountain Home Developers of Sunapee, LLC) shall comply with the clerks order on or before September 20, 2012. If no appearance is filed by September 20, 2012, the defendant will be defaulted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(kad)
April 30, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment, construed as a Motion for Default Judgment as to defendants Mountain Home and Stevens; denying 58 Motion for Leave to File; denying 59 Motion for Discovery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
June 13, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. On or before August 11, 2013, the parties shall notify the court whether a damages hearing will be necessary. If a damages hearing is necessary, it will occur on October 30, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: People's United Bank v. Mountain Home Developers of Sunapee, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bardon Flanders
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Terry Finch
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Flanders
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Home Developers of Sunapee, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Michael Stevens
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Williams
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Williams
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People's United Bank
Represented By: Michael Brendan Doherty
Represented By: Daniel P. Luker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]