Cadell v. XL Specialty Insurance Company

Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sherry Cadell
Counter Claimant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: Sherry Cadell
Case Number: 1:2011cv00394
Filed: August 11, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking and removing 11 Disclosure Statement. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
June 20, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
December 18, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Counsel shall provide the Court with a status report by January 4, 2013. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
March 15, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Joint Sealed Motion to Approve Settlement; granting 56 Joint Assented to Motion to Approve Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and to Vacate Judgment. Judgment entered on 9/13/12 is vacated. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
March 15, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Disposition of Sealed Motions. Documents to be sealed/unsealed as outlined. Motions due by 3/25/2013. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
March 27, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion Regarding Confidentiality. Clerk shall unseal the documents referred to as well as the court's 1/31/13 Order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
May 22, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as provided in this order 67 Motion to Seal Stipulation; motion unsealed. Stipulation 66 is approved. In lieu of sealing the stipulation, original will be returned to the filer and corresponding electronic document removed from CM/ECF. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadell v. XL Specialty Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John C. Barker
Represented By: Paul Michienzie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Cadell
Represented By: John E. Durkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John C. Barker
Represented By: Paul Michienzie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sherry Cadell
Represented By: John E. Durkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]