MMG Insurance Company v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff: MMG Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00430
Filed: September 9, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER approving 4 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4 days. Case Track: Standard. Affirmative defenses stricken without prejudice as outlined. Defendant to amend para. 4 and 6 of its Answer. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/17/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 12/16/2011.(dae)
May 9, 2012 15 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re 14 Motion for Joinder Assented to Motion to Join Best Buy Co., Inc. as an Additional Party Defendant. Plaintiff to file proposed amended complaint as outlined within ten days of this order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 4, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER treating Documents 42 and 43 only as Objections to Motions to Strike. Any motion for leave must be refiled. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
April 16, 2013 58 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 27 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gary Simard; denying 28 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Steven Thomas; denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 34 Motion to Strike [ 27] Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gary Simard; denying as moot 35 Motion to Strike 28 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Steven Thomas; denying as moot 51 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gary Simard; denying as moot 52 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steven Thomas. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 22, 2013 75 Featured Case ORDER on Jury Selection. Panel: 12 jurors, no alternates. Attorney voir dire permitted of seated jurors. Each side limited to a total of 15 minutes for questioning. 3 peremptory challenges for plaintiff and 3 between the defendants. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
June 4, 2013 89 Featured Case ORDER denying 76 Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Reading Portions of Robert Long Discovery Deposition at Trial. Parties to respond as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 5, 2013 90 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion to Strike Expert Designation of Robert W. Long (Renewed); granting 64 Motion to Exclude Reference, Evidence and Argument of Other Potential DVD Fires, Including Any Such Referenced in Internet Blogs and Websites (In Limine); granting 65 Motion to Exclude Burn Testing Performed by Plaintiff's Expert, Steven Thomas (in limine); denying without prejudice 68 Motion in Limine Regarding Spoliation of Evidence and Adverse Inference Jury Instruction; denying 76 Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Reading Portions of Robert Long Discovery Deposition at Trial; denying as moot 80 Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Amended Final Pretrial Statement. Parties to respond as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 18, 2011 9 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 25, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MMG Insurance Company v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas DeMicco
Represented By: Christopher P. Flanagan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMG Insurance Company
Represented By: Upton & Hatfield LLP (No.Conway)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]