Grand Encampment of Knights Templar of the United States of America et al v. Conference of Grand Masters of Masons in North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Grand Commandery of Knights Templar of New Hampshire and Grand Encampment of Knights Templar of the United States of America
Defendant: G. Santy Lascano, William R. Miller, David P. Owen, Richard L. Swaney, Donald H. Yankey, Glenn E. Almy, Ronald G. Andress, Ed Bousquet and Conference of Grand Masters of Masons in North America, Inc.
Unknown: Jennifer Turco Beaudet and Thomas J. Pappas
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00463
Filed: October 3, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiffs may file a supplemental objection to defendants' motions to dismiss on or before 2/17/12. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
January 5, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER denying 23 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
January 18, 2012 36 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss by G. Santy Lascano, William R. Miller, David P. Owen; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss by Ed Bousquet, Conference of Grand Masters of Masons in North America, Inc., Richard L. Swaney; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss by Ronald G. Andress; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss by Glenn E. Almy. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
February 28, 2012 40 Featured Case ///ORDER dismissing without prejudice defendant Donald H. Yankey as no return of service nor motion to extend time to effect service has been filed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
March 6, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration Re: 36 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Court to enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grand Encampment of Knights Templar of the United States of America et al v. Conference of Grand Masters of Masons in North America, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Commandery of Knights Templar of New Hampshire
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Encampment of Knights Templar of the United States of America
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Santy Lascano
Represented By: Mark A. Darling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Miller
Represented By: Mark A. Darling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Owen
Represented By: Mark A. Darling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Swaney
Represented By: Jennifer Turco Beaudet
Represented By: Thomas J. Pappas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H. Yankey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn E. Almy
Represented By: Jamie N. Hage
Represented By: Kathleen A. Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald G. Andress
Represented By: Lawrence B. Gormley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Bousquet
Represented By: Thomas J. Pappas
Represented By: Jennifer Turco Beaudet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conference of Grand Masters of Masons in North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Turco Beaudet
Represented By: Thomas J. Pappas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jennifer Turco Beaudet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Thomas J. Pappas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]