VFS Financing, Inc. v. Brooks Pride 2, LLC et al

Plaintiff: VFS Financing, Inc.
Defendant: Maine Aviation Aircraft Charter, LLC, Brooks Pride 2, LLC and Harold J. Brooks
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00478
Filed: October 12, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2011 12 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re 2 Petition to Attach With Notice and 3 Motion Order of Possession. Clerk to schedule a hearing in accordance with normal deadlines. Procedure on referenced assets as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 28, 2011 14 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Transport of Aircraft for the Purpose of Completing Scheduled Maintenance. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
December 2, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER re: 2 Attachment Petition - With Notice, 3 Motion for Order of Possession. Hearing as to 2 PETITION to Attach With Notice, 3 MOTION Order of Possession set for 12/22/2011 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Lapla nte. Joint timeline and Statement of Agreed Facts due 12/13/2011. Proposed Findings of Fact, Witness and Exhibit List due by 12/20/2011. Preliminary pretrial scheduled for 12/13 is postponed indefinitely. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: VFS Financing, Inc. v. Brooks Pride 2, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VFS Financing, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Antonelli
Represented By: Thomas H. Curran
Represented By: David Himelfarb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maine Aviation Aircraft Charter, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Pride 2, LLC
Represented By: Ronald G. Sutherland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold J. Brooks
Represented By: Mark C. Rouvalis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]