Beaudette v. Bank of America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven J. Beaudette
Defendant: Bank of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00569
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss and Remand; denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
January 18, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
February 7, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff has until 2/17/12 to file an objection to plaintiff's motion to dismiss. Follow up on Objection on 2/17/2012. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
February 15, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration of 14 Order on Motion to Dismiss.Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss has been considered; defendant's motion is granted as held in order 1/18/12. Plaintiff granted opportunity to file amended complaint by 3/1/12; if not filed, case will remain closed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaudette v. Bank of America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Beaudette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Somma
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]