Drouin, et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Kathleen Drouin and Michael Drouin
Defendant: Option One Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00596
Filed: December 29, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER re 23 Motion to Dismiss. Parties to respond as outlined by May 4, 2012. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 18, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 17, 2012 37 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 25, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 23, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Protective Order. Parties to comply as outlined. Preliminary injunction against foreclosure is lifted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 5, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Compel Discovery; striking 53 Motion to Compel More Complete Discovery Answers. Option One shall provide further responses as outlined on or before February 12, 2013. Plaintiffs may seek reimbursement of attorney's fees as outlined on or before March 1, 2013. The parties are advised that any future failure to observe the court's July 26, 2012 order will be met with sanctions. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 1, 2013 70 Featured Case ORDER re 68 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 41(b) and 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Parties to respond as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 8, 2013 71 Featured Case SUMMARY ORDER re attorney's fees: Option One shall remit $275.00 to plaintiffs. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 8, 2013 72 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 68 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 41(b); granting 57 Motion for Robert M.A. Nadeau, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney; denying as moot 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 63 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 9, 2013 74 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 68 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Petition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 41(b); granting 57 Motion for Robert M.A. Nadeau, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney; denying as moot 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 63 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Drouin, et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Drouin
Represented By: Robert M.A. Nadeau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Drouin
Represented By: Robert M.A. Nadeau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option One Mortgage Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paula-Lee Chambers
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Coan
Represented By: Thomas C. Tretter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Coan
Represented By: Paula-Lee Chambers
Represented By: Thomas C. Tretter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]