Guitard v. NH Department of Corrections, Division of Medical and Forensic Services

Notice Only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Division of Medical and Forensic Services
Plaintiff: Jon-Paul Guitard
 
Case Number: 1:2011fp00194
Filed: May 6, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 9 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
July 27, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER correcting the date of issuance 16 Order on Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
May 9, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The initial filing fee is waived due to a balance of $0.41. Consent form due 6/3/2011. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 6/3/2011. (amm)
May 17, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER plaintiff to file amended complaint within 30 days 1 Complaint., ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/16/2011.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guitard v. NH Department of Corrections, Division of Medical and Forensic Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Division of Medical and Forensic Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon-Paul Guitard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]